MO SB115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business, Insurance And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
Pending: Senate Small Business, Insurance And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the conditions for dissolving the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company
Title
Establishes the conditions for dissolving the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 115-Schmitt |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17140187 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB115.pdf |