MO SB113 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the law relating to discharge of employees under workers' compensation statutes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the law relating to discharge of employees under workers' compensation statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-04HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Employment Security
2017-04-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Employment Security
2017-03-28HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Employment Security
2017-03-16HouseReferred H Special Committee on Employment Security
2017-02-28HouseH Second Read
2017-02-27HouseH First Read
2017-02-23SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-02-22SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-02-21SenatePerfected
2017-02-21SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2017-02-21SenateSA 10 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(0248S07.04S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 9 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2017-02-21SenateSA 1 to SA 9 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0248S07.30S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 9 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0248S07.29S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 8 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
2017-02-21SenateSA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0248S07.25S)
2017-02-21SenateSSA 1 for SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0248S07.24S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 8 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0248S07.23S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(0248S07.15S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0248S07.01S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0248S07.17S)
2017-02-21SenateSA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(0248S07.18S)
2017-02-20SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-20SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0248S07.04F)
2017-02-20SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
2017-02-20SenateSSA 2 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(0248S07.03F)
2017-02-20SenateSSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Hegeman)--(0248S07.12S)
2017-02-20SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0248S07.02F)
2017-02-20SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Schaaf)--(0248S07.01F)
2017-02-20SenateSS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(0248S.07F)
2017-01-26SenateReported from S Small Business and Industry Committee, with SCS
2017-01-24SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0248S.03C)
2017-01-17SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 113-Schatz
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback