MO SB111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions regarding bonds issued by a political subdivision, qualifications for candidates of public office, limited liability companies who own property in certain cities, public administrators, and guardianships
Title
Modifies various provisions regarding bonds issued by a political subdivision, qualifications for candidates of public office, limited liability companies who own property in certain cities, public administrators, and guardianships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 111 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 111 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: House: SB 111 (*HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 111 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 111 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: House: SB 111 (*HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0441S04.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR (0441S04.1SR) |
2017-05-08 | House | H conferees change: Vescovo replaces Bondon |
2017-05-08 | House | S conferees appointed: Hegeman, Sater, Wallingford, Rizzo, Sifton |
2017-05-08 | House | H conferees appointed: Crawford, Bondon, Plocher, McCreety, Smith-85 |
2017-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0441H03.18H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H defeated |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 2 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0441H03.35H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(0441H03.21H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Walker)--(0441H03.14H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-85)--(0441H03.13H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 2, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 4 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Smith-85)--(0441H03.17H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 3 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(0441H03.25H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Corlew)--(0441H03.32H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(0441H03.29H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Schroer)--(0441H03.05H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Vescovo)--(0441H03.04H) |
2017-04-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Consent |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials - Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 111-Hegeman |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |