MO SB1075 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1075-Wallingford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1075-Wallingford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Silver Alert System to aid in identifying and locating a missing endangered person
Title
Creates the Silver Alert System to aid in identifying and locating a missing endangered person
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1075-Wallingford |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote failed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1075-Wallingford |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28812398 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1075.pdf |