MO SB1058 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | S First Read |