MO SB1050 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS#2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS#2
2018-05-17HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-14HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2018-05-11HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-11HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-10HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-10HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2018-05-08HouseReturned to the committee of origin (Transportation)
2018-05-07HouseH Rules - Administrative Oversight voted to return bill to committee of origin (Transportation)
2018-05-02HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation
2018-04-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2018-04-30HouseCommittee Vote Reconsidered
2018-04-25HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2018-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H Transportation
2018-04-19HouseReferred H Transportation
2018-04-16HouseH Second Read
2018-04-12HouseH First Read
2018-04-11SenateS Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2018-04-11SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-04-11SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-04-09SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-04-09SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-04-05SenatePerfected
2018-04-05SenateSS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2018-04-05SenateSA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(6654S05.01F)
2018-04-05SenateSA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(6654S05.05S)
2018-04-05SenateSA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(6654S05.01S)
2018-04-05SenateSA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(6654S05.03S)
2018-04-05SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(6654S.05F)
2018-04-05SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2018-04-03SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-04-03SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(6654S03.01S)
2018-04-03SenateSS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(6654S.03F)
2018-03-29SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2018-03-29SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (6654S.02C)
2018-03-15SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-03-08SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-02-28SenateS First Read--SB 1050-Schatz

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback