MO SB1025 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts instructional classes from sales tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts instructional classes from sales tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 1025 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 1025 (*HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 1025 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 1025 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseVetoed by Governor
2016-05-25HouseDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned by House Speaker
2016-05-25HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2016-05-25HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2016-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2016-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2016-05-13HouseHA 1 H offered & defeated (Hough)--(4443S03.06H)
2016-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-05HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2016-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
2016-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
2016-05-02HouseReferred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6)
2016-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Ways and Means
2016-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Ways and Means
2016-04-26HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means
2016-04-19HouseReferred H Ways and Means
2016-04-19HouseH Second Read
2016-04-18HouseH First Read
2016-04-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2016-04-14SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2016-04-13SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight)
2016-04-07SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2016-04-06SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2016-04-06SenatePerfected
2016-02-25SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee
2016-02-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2016-02-18SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2016-02-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2016-02-03SenateS First Read--SB 1025-Kraus

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback