MO SB1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SBs 1, 22, 49 & 70-Pearce (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SBs 1, 22, 49 & 70-Pearce (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SBs 1, 22, 49 & 70-Pearce (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 17 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0479S09.05S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 16 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0479S09.92S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 15 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0479S09.87S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 14 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0479S09.93S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 13 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0479S09.91S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 13 to SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0479S09.48S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 12 to SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0479S09.24S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 11 to SCS S offered & adopted (Curls)--(0479S09.80S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 10 to SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0479S09.21S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 9 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 9 to SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(0479S09.89S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 9 to SCS S offered (Onder)--(0479S09.76S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 9 to SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0479S09.50S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SA 8 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 2 to SA 8 to SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0479S09.82S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 8 to SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0479S09.81S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 8 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0479S09.71S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 7 to SCS S offered & adopted (LeVota)--(0479S09.62S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 6 to SCS S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(0479S09.63S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 5 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0479S09.78S) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S withdrawn |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Pointed of order ruled Not Well Taken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Point of order - Beyond scope |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(0479S09.61S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0479S09.67S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered (Romine)--(0479S09.36S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0479S09.40S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SSA 2 for SA 1 to SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SA 1 to SSA 2 for SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0479S09.66S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SSA 2 for SA 1 to SCS S offered (Dempsey)--(0479S09.59S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS, as amended, S defeated |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SA 3 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0479S09.53S) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SA 2 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0479S09.51S) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S withdrawn |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S offered (Onder)--(0479S09.26S) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S offered (Onder)--(0479S09.25S) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Pearce)--(0479S09.01S) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-02-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1, 22, 49 & 70) S Education Committee (0479S.09C) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1-Pearce |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |