MO HRB2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals obsolete, expired, sunset, and terminated statutory sections and portions of sections
Title
Repeals obsolete, expired, sunset, and terminated statutory sections and portions of sections
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HRB2&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6604H.01I.pdf |