MO HR783 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the use of the House Chamber to the YMCA Youth in Government State Conventions from November 14-16, 2019, and December 5-7, 2019
Title
Grants the use of the House Chamber to the YMCA Youth in Government State Conventions from November 14-16, 2019, and December 5-7, 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Offered (H) - Use of the House Chamber and House Hearing Rooms Thursday, December 5, 2019, through Saturday, December 7, 2019 YMCA Youth in Government Clark State Convention and Thursday, November 14, 2019, through Saturday, November 16, 2019, YMCA Youth in Government Lewis State Convention |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR783&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1959H.01I.pdf |