MO HJR85 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax assessments.
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to property tax assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR85&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4528H.01I.pdf |