MO HJR23 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing excursion gambling boats and floating facilities on the Osage River
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing excursion gambling boats and floating facilities on the Osage River
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |