MO HJR23 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment imposing an 1% temporary, 10-year increase in the state sales and use tax to be used for transportation projects
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment imposing an 1% temporary, 10-year increase in the state sales and use tax to be used for transportation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |