MO HJR20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment reducing the number of members of the House of Representatives from 163 to 120 and increasing the number of members of the Senate from 34 to 40 beginning in 2023
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment reducing the number of members of the House of Representatives from 163 to 120 and increasing the number of members of the Senate from 34 to 40 beginning in 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR20&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HJR0020I.htm |