MO HJR132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for votes required to pass constitutional amendments
Title
Modifies requirements for votes required to pass constitutional amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |