MO HJR11 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment affirming the right of farmers and ranchers to engage in modern farming and ranching practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment affirming the right of farmers and ranchers to engage in modern farming and ranching practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-05-22SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2013-05-22SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2013-05-14SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 6
2013-05-14SenateSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 7
2013-05-14SenateSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2013-05-14SenateThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 25
2013-05-14SenateHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 24
2013-05-13SenateHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2013-05-09SenateConferees Re-appointed (S) - SENATORS PARSON, MUNZLINGER, BROWN, JUSTUS, SIFTON
2013-05-09SenateConferees Re-appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES RICHARDSON, REIBOLDT, BLACK
2013-05-09SenateConferees to Exceed Differences (H)
2013-05-09SenateHouse Grants Conference (H)
2013-05-09SenateConferees to Exceed Differences (S)
2013-05-09SenateSenate Requests Further Conference (S)
2013-05-09SenateSenate Refuses to Concur (S) - REQUESTS HOUSE GRANT FURTHER CONFERENCE
2013-05-08SenateSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) - MOTION TO ADOPT CCR WITHDRAWN
2013-05-08HouseReported to The Senate (S)
2013-05-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 26
2013-05-08HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 25
2013-05-02HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2013-04-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH(120), REIBOLDT, BLACK
2013-04-29HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS PARSON, MUNZLINGER, BROWN, JUSTUS, SIFTON
2013-04-29HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2013-04-24HouseHouse Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2013-04-10SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED
2013-04-10SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 32 NOES: 1
2013-04-10SenateSS Adopted (S)
2013-04-10SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-04-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SS/SA 1 PENDING
2013-04-10SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2013-04-10SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-04-10SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2013-04-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
2013-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 8:25AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
2013-04-08SenateReferred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2013-04-04SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2013-03-28SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
2013-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-03-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 27, 2013, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2013-03-13SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
2013-03-04HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-02-28HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 41
2013-02-28HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-02-28HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2013-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2013-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-27HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2013-02-27HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED
2013-02-27HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2013-02-27HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2013-02-14HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-02-14HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-02-14HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-12HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-02-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-02-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-02-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-01-31HouseRe-referred to Committee: Agriculture Policy(H)
2013-01-31HouseReferred: Emerging Issues in Agriculture(H)
2013-01-22HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback