MO HJR109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for voter identification.
Title
Modifies provisions for voter identification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR109&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5057H.02I.pdf |