MO HJR102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for initiative petitions for constitutional amendments.
Title
Modifies provisions for initiative petitions for constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |