MO HJR100 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies constitutional provisions relating to determination of state congressional districts and lobbyist gifts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies constitutional provisions relating to determination of state congressional districts and lobbyist gifts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: HJR 100 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House: HJR 100 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HJR 100 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HJR 100 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 90 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HJR 100 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-17SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2018-05-16SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2018-05-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-05-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-11HouseTaken Up
2018-05-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-10HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-09HousePerfected (H) - AYES: 89 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-05-09HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-05-09HouseTaken Up
2018-05-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-02HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-05-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-04-30HouseReferred: Government Efficiency(H)
2018-03-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback