MO HCR79 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opposes legislative or regulatory actions that are not based on sound science that may restrict the use of modern agricultural technologies
Title
Opposes legislative or regulatory actions that are not based on sound science that may restrict the use of modern agricultural technologies
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: HCR 79 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |