MO HCR78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Secretary of the USDA to investigate the August 9, 2019, fire at the Tyson beef processing plant in Holcomb, Kansas, for market manipulation.
Title
Urges the Secretary of the USDA to investigate the August 9, 2019, fire at the Tyson beef processing plant in Holcomb, Kansas, for market manipulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 24 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |