MO HCR7 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Urges the United States government to condemn the persecution of Falun Gong practitioners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the United States government to condemn the persecution of Falun Gong practitioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House: HCR 7 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateReferred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2017-04-25HouseReported to the Senate (S)
2017-04-25HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 149 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-25HouseTaken Up
2017-04-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-06HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-16HouseReferred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H)
2017-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback