MO HCR64 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to enact Senate Bill 89 relating to an exemption for certain vessels from federal fire-retardant materials requirements
Title
Urges the U.S. Congress to enact Senate Bill 89 relating to an exemption for certain vessels from federal fire-retardant materials requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House: HCR 64 HCRs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate (S) |
2018-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |