MO HCR63 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to reject and revoke President Obama's Executive Order on firearm control
Title
Urges Congress to reject and revoke President Obama's Executive Order on firearm control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: HCR 63 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: HCR 63 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: HCR 63 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2016, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-10 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 118 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 2 |
2016-02-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |