MO HCR58 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urges public schools to institute JROTC in their schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges public schools to institute JROTC in their schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2018-04-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-10HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2018-04-10HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-18HouseReferred: Veterans(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback