MO HCR5 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution that place limits on the federal government
Title
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution that place limits on the federal government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCR5&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0136H.01I.pdf |