MO HCR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Rules - No Action Taken (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - Rules - No Action Taken (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disapproves and suspends a proposed amendment to 4CSR 240-20.100 regarding the Electric Utility Renewable Energy Standards Requirements
Title
Disapproves and suspends a proposed amendment to 4CSR 240-20.100 regarding the Electric Utility Renewable Energy Standards Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | Rules - No Action Taken (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2011-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR5&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HCR0005I.htm |