MO HCR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly urges the Army Corps of Engineers to not proceed with the Jameson Island project unless excavated soil is deposited outside the meander belt and not into the Missouri River
Title
Strongly urges the Army Corps of Engineers to not proceed with the Jameson Island project unless excavated soil is deposited outside the meander belt and not into the Missouri River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Adopted (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR48&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HCR0048I.htm |