MO HCR4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Submits to Congress a proposed federal balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution
Title
Submits to Congress a proposed federal balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR4&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HCR0004I.htm |