MO HCR34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages Congress to reinstate the Secure Rural Schools program at its previous funding levels and maintain funding under the Impact Aid law
Title
Encourages Congress to reinstate the Secure Rural Schools program at its previous funding levels and maintain funding under the Impact Aid law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - HCR 34 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Education(H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |