MO HCR24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - Escort Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - Escort Committee
Summary
Joint Session Wednesday, February 9, 2011, 2:00pm, for the State of the Judiciary message from the Honorable William Ray Price, Jr., Chief Justice of the State of Missouri
Title
Joint Session Wednesday, February 9, 2011, 2:00pm, for the State of the Judiciary message from the Honorable William Ray Price, Jr., Chief Justice of the State of Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Escort Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Escort Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Adopted (S) | |
2011-02-07 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2011-02-07 | Adopted (H) | |
2011-02-07 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR24&year=2011&code=R |