MO HCR24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages students and faculty to promote international education at Missouri colleges and universities.
Title
Encourages students and faculty to promote international education at Missouri colleges and universities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Referred: Higher Education (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR24&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HCR0024I.htm |