MO HCR17 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Calls for an Article V convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calls for an Article V convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-18HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-01-26HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback