MO HCB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal justice.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: HCB 2 (*HA 4) HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: HCB 2 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: HCB 2 HCBs for PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 adopted |
2019-04-17 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-17 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Authorized - Delivered to Special Committee on Criminal Justice |