MO HB995 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the tax imposed on motor fuel from 17 cents per gallon to 19 cents per gallon
Title
Increases the tax imposed on motor fuel from 17 cents per gallon to 19 cents per gallon
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB995&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0995I.PDF |