MO HB994 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding school accreditation
Title
Changes the laws regarding school accreditation
Sponsors
Rep. Cole McNary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB994&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0994I.htm |