MO HB990 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds automotive lubricants to the list of petroleum products regulated by the Department of Agriculture
Title
Adds automotive lubricants to the list of petroleum products regulated by the Department of Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB990&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0990I.htm |