MO HB944 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding firearms.
Title
Changes the law regarding firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 944 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 116 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 116 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Friday, May 7, 9:15 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 7 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3 as amended, HA 4 Adopted, |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |