MO HB932 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding step therapy for prescription drugs
Title
Changes the laws regarding step therapy for prescription drugs
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB932&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0932I.PDF |