MO HB930 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Referred: Tax Reform (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Referred: Tax Reform (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the state income tax deduction for federal income tax liability beginning January 1, 2012
Title
Eliminates the state income tax deduction for federal income tax liability beginning January 1, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB930&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0930I.htm |