MO HB928 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions
Title
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: HB 928 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |