MO HB920 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that certain healthcare products shall be available to prisoners at no cost while held in custody

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that certain healthcare products shall be available to prisoners at no cost while held in custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 920 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 920 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 920 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 33 N: 92 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2019-04-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-04HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-04-03HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2019-04-03HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-03HouseTaken Up
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-04-03HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-07HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-03-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-27HouseReferred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
2019-02-13HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback