MO HB917 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all fire protection districts and municipal fire departments in St. Louis County to consolidate into one fire district upon the approval of the voters of the county
Title
Requires all fire protection districts and municipal fire departments in St. Louis County to consolidate into one fire district upon the approval of the voters of the county
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB917&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0917I.htm |