MO HB887 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Revenue from selling or disclosing certain driver record information
Title
Prohibits the Department of Revenue from selling or disclosing certain driver record information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB887&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0887I.htm |