MO HB886 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the General Assembly to remove any department director or deputy director if it determines that the removal is necessary for the betterment of the public service
Title
Authorizes the General Assembly to remove any department director or deputy director if it determines that the removal is necessary for the betterment of the public service
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB886&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0886I.htm |