MO HB877 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an electric utility to accept electricity produced from a customer who operates an electric generating facility in the service area of the utility
Title
Requires an electric utility to accept electricity produced from a customer who operates an electric generating facility in the service area of the utility
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2011-03-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB877&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0877I.htm |