MO HB864 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that any rule promulgated by a state agency that will have a major impact on any persons or entities in the state shall be approved by the General Assembly and the Governor
Title
Specifies that any rule promulgated by a state agency that will have a major impact on any persons or entities in the state shall be approved by the General Assembly and the Governor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |