MO HB843 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of St. Joseph to impose, upon voter approval, a sales tax of up to 0.5% for the operation of public safety departments
Title
Authorizes the City of St. Joseph to impose, upon voter approval, a sales tax of up to 0.5% for the operation of public safety departments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB843&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0843I.htm |