MO HB840 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that any person who causes substantial physical injury or death to a service dog must be ordered to fully compensate for the injury, loss, or replacement of the service dog
Title
Specifies that any person who causes substantial physical injury or death to a service dog must be ordered to fully compensate for the injury, loss, or replacement of the service dog
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB840&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0840I.PDF |