MO HB828 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Small Business, Insurance And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Small Business, Insurance And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding prevailing wages
Title
Changes the laws regarding prevailing wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-21 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2011-04-20 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-20 | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-19 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |